JRC SIMPSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DIANA PARKES Trustee 23 July 2014 None on record
Heather Mary Quinn Trustee 12 January 2019 None on record
Joanna Crookall Chair 30 June 2017 None on record
Alexander Christopher Brown Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
Katherine Diane Brown Trustee 10 June 2020 None on record
Heidi Jackson Trustee 04 December 2015 None on record
Jenifer Mary Stanley Trustee 12 January 2019 None on record
Andrew Duncan Hunter Trustee 12 January 2019 None on record
Janet Gaynor Bailey Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record