ACTION DEAFNESS

Charity number: 1163758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 August 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 August 2020 21 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 September 2019 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 12 September 2019 44 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 30 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time Download