ACTION DEAFNESS

Charity number: 1163758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.73m £1.94m £2.32m £2.89m £3.74m
Total expenditure £1.78m £1.96m £2.24m £2.88m £3.75m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £2.19m N/A N/A
Income from government grants £73.79k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.77k £58.85k £61.88k £19.32k £80.82k
Income - Other trading activities £22.32k £28.49k £23.35k £57.45k £73.01k
Income - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.85m £2.23m £2.82m £3.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.30k £336 £373 £757 £387
Income - Other £2.14k £0 £0 £0 £68.61k
Income - Legacies £1.97k £0 £0 £14.59k £73.77k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.78m £1.96m £2.24m £2.88m £3.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £443 £0 £0 £4.19k £27.86k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0