Financial history COMMUNITY CHURCH, PUTNEY

Charity number: 1158141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £304.80k £386.62k £372.99k £346.74k £332.78k
Total expenditure £274.99k £337.00k £318.25k £274.82k £259.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A