DARTMOOR ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1158422
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 January 2017 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time Download