DARTMOOR ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1158422
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.19m £1.28m £1.14m £1.12m £1.19m
Total expenditure £1.18m £1.27m £1.25m £1.20m £1.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £2.50k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.04k £21.04k £23.00k £21.16k £14.77k
Income - Other trading activities £376.47k £396.80k £389.28k £340.10k £378.75k
Income - Charitable activities £807.37k £859.69k £726.28k £758.74k £800.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £86 £186
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £740.53k £799.20k £810.67k £830.43k £863.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £44.54k £30.72k £32.93k £21.39k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £27.08k £23.74k £10.08k £9.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £33.26k £430.31k £404.52k £339.11k £352.58k