READING UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1158523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 June 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 11 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 11 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 01 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 24 March 2017 On time Download