Financial history PENDLE DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £5.19k £1.41k £2.94k £5.34k £1.49k
Total expenditure £14.14k £8.13k £6.91k £10.51k £3.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A