Accounts and annual returns PRODUCT OF A POSTCODE

Charity number: 1157899
Charity reporting is overdue by 268 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 268 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 268 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 January 2023 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 January 2023 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 November 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 November 2020 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 November 2020 388 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 November 2020 388 days late Download Open in new window