THE CHIPPING NORTON AREA CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1158463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 29 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 April 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 13 April 2021 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 26 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 26 March 2020 On time
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 08 December 2017 On time