RISE:61

Charity number: 1158086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL AUSTIN PARTRIDGE Chair 25 July 2015 None on record
Minke van Til Trustee 22 October 2016 None on record
Andrew Peter Malcolm Trustee 04 July 2020
RENOVARE, BRITAIN AND IRELAND Received: On time
ST CHRISTOPHER'S EDUCATIONAL TRUST (INCORPORATING THE HUGHES AND STEVENS BEQUEST) Received: On time
Lisa Kerley Trustee 22 October 2016 None on record
Mark Keith Summerill Trustee 30 November 2019 None on record
Elizabeth Ann Pollard Trustee 14 July 2019 None on record