Financial history HEART OF BIRMINGHAM VOCATIONAL COLLEGE LTD

Charity number: 1157785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £912.25k £1.24m £1.52m £1.74m £2.45m
Total expenditure £793.35k £1.33m £1.65m £1.74m £2.20m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £1.70m £2.26m
Income from government grants £893.14k £1.20m £1.46m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £28.11k £38.31k £60.45k £48.62k £28.26k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £893.14k £1.20m £1.46m £1.70m £2.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £165.12k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £793.35k £1.33m £1.65m £1.74m £2.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0