HAMSTERLEY AND LOW WESTWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required