THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 March 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required