THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kim Anderson Trustee 02 July 2018 None on record
Kevin Blewitt Chair 31 March 2014 None on record
Michael Bates Trustee 19 October 2015 None on record
Dave Johnson Trustee 31 March 2009 None on record
ERLAND POLDEN Trustee 26 February 2018
THE FRIENDS OF WASHINGTON OLD HALL Overdue by 30 days