Trustees CUMBRIA FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS - NORTHERN DISTRICT
Charity number: 504832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABIGAIL GRAHAM | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LAURA PALMER | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SYDNEY SIMPSON | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||
BRADLEY MCMANUS | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Lucy Winter | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN STORY | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
KATIE MAUGHAN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
EMMA BLAYLOCK | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jack Jenkinson | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
AMBER RIDDICK | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
LAURA FOWLER | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Chloe Dodd | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|||||
LEE MITCHINSON | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GRAHAM | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
MATTHEW FEARON | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
RACHEL ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|||||
MOLLY STEADMAN | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JAMIE LIGHTFOOT | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELLA BATEY | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JADE HAUGHAN | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|||||
CHLOE BROUGH | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ISAAC COLLINS | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ELLIE NAYLOR | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ROSIE PRATT | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
TOM KIRK | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
ABIGAIL FISHER | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JOSIE MITCHINSON | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|||||
AMY BLAMIRE | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATIE FOSTER | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
MEGAN HARRISON | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.