BELONG NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 1160407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £92.85k £159.34k £219.65k £213.16k
Total expenditure £0 £84.64k £169.11k £208.56k £222.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A