TON PENTRE AND DISTRICT RECREATION ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1157358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN LEE EVANS Trustee 30 June 2018 None on record
Andrew John Evans Trustee 06 July 2019 None on record
Timothy John Jones Trustee 30 June 2018 None on record
LYN EDWARDS Trustee 11 September 2014 None on record
Geraint Richard Evans Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
Gavin Elliott Trustee 30 June 2018 None on record
Lynn Marie Thomas Trustee 30 June 2018 None on record
John Chapman Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
SHELLEY REBECCA REES-OWEN Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
JONATHON WYN WILLIAMS Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
CRAIG ANTHONY WEAVER Trustee 30 June 2018 None on record
MAUREEN OWEN WEAVER Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record