Trustees TRANSFORMING COMMUNITIES TOGETHER
Charity number: 1157772
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rt Revd Sarah Bullock | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Daphne Francis | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jassica Castillo-Burley | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Amanda Mallen | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Higham | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
The Venerable Julian Francis | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
David John Cope BDS | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.