Trustees THE ROCK ACADEMY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Lang Chair 26 November 2020
None on record
Thomas Andrew Stuart Wolfe-Collins Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Ann Murphy Trustee 29 July 2019
None on record
RICHARD STAINTHORP Trustee 06 July 2017
Friends of Reading Museum
Received: On time
CAVERSHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
E P COLLIER SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Nicholas Blake Trustee 06 July 2017
None on record
Joseph Da Silva Trustee 29 March 2015
None on record
IAN STOCK Trustee 08 September 2014
PTEN UK AND IRELAND PATIENT GROUP
Received: On time