Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1157822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 June 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 June 2021 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 28 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window