ST PAULS CHURCH WORCESTER

Charity number: 1159042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time Download