COMMSORTIA LIMITED

Charity number: 1158524
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £53.26k £976.49k £2.63m £2.02m £2.24m
Total expenditure £50.14k £887.60k £2.65m £2.03m £2.17m
Income from government contracts £0 £665.29k £2.42m £1.89m £1.69m
Income from government grants £50.00k £0 £207.81k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £976.49k £2.63m £2.02m £2.24m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £887.60k £2.65m £2.03m £2.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £1.98k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0