Financial history THE JERUSALEM AND THE MIDDLE EAST CHURCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1158476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £236.24k £1.38m £198.88k £95.20k £283.31k
Total expenditure £285.07k £323.05k £515.38k £440.17k £467.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £134.23k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £146.31k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £1.10m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £50.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £312.20k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £10.84k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A