Trustees BRADFORD CITY OF SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1160553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILL SUTCLIFFE Chair 28 August 2008
BEACON (BRADFORD ECUMENICAL ASYLUM CONCERN)
Received: On time
Clementine Chitulangoma Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Susan Naylor Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Esther Douglas Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Rosie MacPherson Trustee 24 August 2020
None on record
Kay Holden Trustee 16 May 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CLAYTON
Received: 13 days late