BRITISH GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £185.95k £180.70k £205.05k £327.22k £390.40k
Total expenditure £114.08k £113.95k £172.33k £348.21k £357.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £0 £27.54k £148.80k £146.97k