Accounts and annual returns THE CHRISTIAN WAY OF LIFE CHURCHES LIMITED

Charity number: 1160836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 September 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 03 December 2019 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 September 2018 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 September 2018 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 05 September 2017 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required