Financial history PODIUM.ME

Charity number: 1160250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.61k £19.17k £300 £175 £2.50k
Total expenditure £5.47k £5.65k £4.70k £2.19k £2.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A