Financial history MEDICAL MUSIC SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 1157835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £33.63k £14.74k £7.40k £7.30k £9.70k
Total expenditure £12.22k £13.21k £7.05k £9.98k £11.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A