Accounts and annual returns SEAHAVEN WILDLIFE RESCUE

Charity number: 1163126
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 January 2020 04 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2020 11 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 August 2018 02 July 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 August 2018 11 August 2019 60 days late Download Open in new window