QUAKER CONGO PARTNERSHIP UK

Charity number: 1159781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download