KETTON SPORTS AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1159624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 April 2020 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 April 2020 66 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 August 2019 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 August 2019 198 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 October 2018 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 October 2018 264 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 August 2017 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 August 2017 202 days late Download