KETTON SPORTS AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1159624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £46.81k £152.67k £175.60k £12.34k £7.67k
Total expenditure £13.18k £150.65k £176.94k £11.38k £13.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A