Financial history Coetir Anian

Charity number: 1158185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.22k £7.38k £33.12k £352.66k £247.40k
Total expenditure £2.97k £18.06k £45.56k £185.44k £163.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £22.04k £349.77k £205.11k