Financial history THE CONVEYANCING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £67.20k £71.41k £90.26k £81.90k £87.45k
Total expenditure £76.69k £61.82k £68.69k £61.39k £51.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A