FUTURE INCLUSIONS ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1159918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 27 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 16 January 2020 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 22 October 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required