THE SOMERSET AND DORSET RAILWAY TRUST LTD.

Charity number: 1158865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £69.53k £43.48k £53.73k £58.80k £81.76k
Total expenditure £142.18k £53.54k £44.54k £51.09k £35.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A