Accounts and annual returns THE FRANK RICHARD PATRICK CHARITY

Charity number: 505066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 18 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 18 March 2022 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 13 November 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 20 December 2019 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 31 October 2018 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required