DROYLSDEN & DISTRICT FOODBANK

Charity number: 1159438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.15k £2.65k £3.00k £3.03k £25.53k
Total expenditure £3.74k £2.39k £1.59k £2.57k £4.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k