THE SHEFFIELD FIRTH ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1159083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 24 August 2016 On time Download