THE SHEFFIELD FIRTH ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1159083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £147.83k £137.56k £135.71k £175.88k £185.75k
Total expenditure £144.54k £124.36k £209.33k £154.83k £152.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £831 £0 £0 N/A N/A