SHERWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity number: 1158333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £167.05k £87.76k £85.04k £86.56k £91.45k
Total expenditure £74.50k £79.24k £86.66k £97.61k £87.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £13.75k £10.57k N/A N/A