THE CHELTENHAM TRUST

Charity number: 1158606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jaki Meeking-Davis Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
Gemma Taylor Trustee 02 July 2021 None on record
Paul Owen Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
DUNCAN JOHN SMITH Trustee 01 May 2014 None on record
Alisha Chloe Marie Lewis Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
Benjamin Averis Trustee 02 July 2021 None on record
Jeanette Young Trustee 03 July 2020 None on record
Sian Morgan Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record
Clive Rawlings Trustee 03 July 2020 None on record
Sunita Nelson Trustee 03 July 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Narey Trustee 03 July 2020 None on record
Kate Peden Trustee 03 July 2020 None on record
LOUIS LESLIE ALEXANDER EPERJESI Chair 02 February 2018 None on record