Financial history WEST WALES POUNDIES DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1160474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £81.65k £92.83k £80.50k £125.91k £126.30k
Total expenditure £70.27k £81.11k £82.54k £96.13k £120.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £23.00k