Accounts and annual returns BEAUHARROW GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1159752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 30 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 30 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 10 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window