WHITBY HIDDEN IMPAIRMENTS SUPPORT AND HELP

Charity number: 1160390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 12 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 24 May 2016 On time Download