Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF CANNIZARO PARK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEP 2019 as amended on 07 Jun 2021 as amended on 12 Jun 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE:(A) TO CONSERVE AND IMPROVE CANNIZARO PARK LOCATED IN WIMBLEDON, LONDON SW19 (‘THE PARK’) AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ECOLOGICAL INTEREST AND BEAUTY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON AND THE BROADER COMMUNITY OF LONDON AND OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES; (B) TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT INCLUDING: PROMOTING, SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING IN THE (I) CONTINUATION OF THE PARK’S STATUS AS A GRADE II LISTED GARDEN; (II) ENHANCEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE PARK BY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.