BROADWAY COMMUNITY LIBRARY LTD

Charity number: 1160668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 March 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 03 March 2021 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 February 2021 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 16 May 2018 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 03 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required