BROADWAY COMMUNITY LIBRARY LTD

Charity number: 1160668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £15.97k £2.75k £5.50k £5.50k £5.50k
Total expenditure £0 £2.50k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A