Financial history REMEMBER MY BABY REMEMBRANCE PHOTOGRAPHY

Charity number: 1159657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £50.27k £68.43k £87.39k £84.81k £56.64k
Total expenditure £27.17k £46.25k £31.38k £32.09k £24.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A